Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexandre-Léopold Sebaux

Deceased

Bishop of Angoulême, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Jul 1820Born
1 Apr 184322.7Ordained PriestPriest
21 Dec 187252.4SelectedBishop of Angoulême, France
21 Mar 187352.7ConfirmedBishop of Angoulême, France
4 May 187352.8Ordained BishopBishop of Angoulême, France
14 May 187352.8InstalledBishop of Angoulême, France
17 May 189170.8DiedBishop of Angoulême, France

MicroData Summary for Alexandre-Léopold Sebaux (VIAF: 89781230)
Bishop Alexandre-Léopold Sebaux (born , died ) Bishop of Angoulême

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLaval, Diocese of Laval
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Laval, Diocese of Laval

  • a priest for 48.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 260
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1873, Number 23

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017