Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Albert-Marie-Camille de Briey

Deceased

Bishop of Saint-Dié, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1826Born
14 Jul 186134.6Ordained PriestPriest
27 Apr 187649.4SelectedBishop of Saint-Dié, France
26 Jun 187649.6ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Dié, France
24 Aug 187649.7Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Dié, France
10 Nov 188862.0DiedBishop of Saint-Dié, France

MicroData Summary for Albert-Marie-Camille de Briey (VIAF: 71381716)
Bishop Albert-Marie-Camille de Briey (born , died ) Bishop of Saint-Dié

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMagné-en-Gençais
Ordained BishopCathedral, Poitiers, Diocese of Poitiers

  • a priest for 27.3 years
  • a bishop for 12.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 241
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1876, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 26 Mar 2017