Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Louis Gay

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Poitiers, France

Titular Bishop of Anthedon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Oct 1815Born
17 May 184529.6Ordained PriestPriest
23 Oct 187762.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Poitiers, France
23 Oct 187762.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Anthedon
25 Nov 187762.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Anthedon
18 May 188064.6ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Poitiers, France
19 Jan 189276.2DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Poitiers, France

MicroData Summary for Charles-Louis Gay (VIAF: 49256462)
Bishop Charles-Louis Gay (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Poitiers

EventPlace
Birth PlaceParis, Archdiocese of Paris
Ordained BishopCathedral, Poitiers, Diocese of Poitiers

  • a priest for 46.6 years
  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 106
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1877, Number 50

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017