Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Eugène Rougerie

Deceased

Bishop of Pamiers, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Jan 1832Born
7 Oct 185523.7Ordained PriestPriest of Limoges, France
17 Feb 188149.0SelectedBishop of Pamiers, France
13 May 188149.3ConfirmedBishop of Pamiers, France
29 Jun 188149.4Ordained BishopBishop of Pamiers, France
20 Feb 190775.0DiedBishop of Pamiers, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Eugène Rougerie (VIAF: 63385858)
Bishop Pierre-Eugène Rougerie (born , died ) Bishop of Pamiers

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAixe-sur-Vienne
Ordained BishopCathedral, Limoges, Diocese of Limoges

  • a priest for 51.3 years
  • a bishop for 25.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 112
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1881, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 4 Jun 2017