Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Paul-Gaston de Pins

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Lyon (-Vienne)

Titular Archbishop of Amasea


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1766BornCastre
28 Mar 178822.1Ordained PriestPriest
9 Sep 181751.6SelectedBishop of Béziers, France
1 Oct 181751.6ConfirmedBishop of Béziers, France
22 Feb 182256.0SelectedBishop of Limoges, France
27 Sep 182256.6ConfirmedBishop of Limoges, France
10 Nov 182256.8Ordained BishopBishop of Limoges, France
27 Dec 182357.9AppointedApostolic Administrator of Lyon (-Vienne), France
3 May 182458.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Amasea
2 Jul 184074.4ResignedApostolic Administrator of Lyon (-Vienne), France
30 Nov 185084.8DiedApostolic Administrator Emeritus of Lyon (-Vienne), France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Paul-Gaston de Pins:
Archbishop Jean-Paul-Gaston de Pins (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator Emeritus of Lyon (-Vienne)

  • a priest for 62.7 years
  • a bishop for 28.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 69, and Page 112
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 235, and Page 246

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013