Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Guillaume-Aubin de Villèle

Deceased

Archbishop of Bourges


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Feb 1770BornCaraman
30 Mar 179323.1Ordained PriestPriest
9 Sep 181747.6SelectedBishop of Verdun, France
1 Oct 181747.6ConfirmedBishop of Verdun, France
8 Jul 182050.4SelectedBishop of Soissons, France
28 Aug 182050.5ConfirmedBishop of Soissons, France
24 Sep 182050.6Ordained BishopBishop of Soissons, France
30 Nov 182454.8SelectedArchbishop of Bourges, France
21 Mar 182555.1ConfirmedArchbishop of Bourges, France
21 Jun 182555.4InstalledArchbishop of Bourges, France
25 Nov 184171.8DiedArchbishop of Bourges, France

Note(s): ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Guillaume-Aubin de Villèle:
Archbishop Guillaume-Aubin de Villèle (born , died ) Archbishop of Bourges

  • a priest for 48.7 years
  • a bishop for 21.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 113, and Page 354
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 397

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013