Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Prosper de Tournefort

Deceased

Bishop of Limoges


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Dec 1761BornVilles-sur-Auzon
7 Sep 180038.7Ordained PriestPriest
8 Dec 182462.9SelectedBishop of Limoges, France
21 Mar 182563.2ConfirmedBishop of Limoges, France
15 May 182563.3Ordained BishopBishop of Limoges, France
7 Mar 184482.2DiedBishop of Limoges, France

MicroData Summary for Prosper de Tournefort (VIAF: 198052193)
Bishop Prosper de Tournefort (born , died ) Bishop of Limoges

  • a priest for 43.5 years
  • a bishop for 18.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 235
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1825, Number 17

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 25 Nov 2016