Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustin de Mailhet de Vachères

Deceased

Bishop of Tulle


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Aug 1763BornPrésailles
29 May 179026.8Ordained PriestPriest
30 Nov 182461.3SelectedBishop of Tulle, France
21 Mar 182561.6ConfirmedBishop of Tulle, France
24 Apr 182561.7Ordained BishopBishop of Tulle, France
16 May 184278.7DiedBishop of Tulle, France

MicroData Summary for Augustin de Mailhet de Vachères:
Bishop Augustin de Mailhet de Vachères (born , died ) Bishop of Tulle

  • a priest for 52.0 years
  • a bishop for 17.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 382

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013