Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jean-Baptist-Marie-Anne-Antoine Cardinal de Latil

Deceased

Archbishop of Reims

Cardinal-Priest of San Sisto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Mar 1761BornIsland of Sainte-Marguerite
1784²22.8Ordained PriestPriest of Paris, France
8 Mar 181655.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Amyclae
7 Apr 181655.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amyclae
9 Sep 181756.5SelectedBishop of Chartres, France
1 Oct 181756.5ConfirmedBishop of Chartres, France
8 May 182463.1SelectedArchbishop of Reims, France
12 Jul 182463.3ConfirmedArchbishop of Reims, France
13 Mar 182665.0Elevated to Cardinal
21 May 182968.2InstalledCardinal-Priest of San Sisto
1 Dec 183978.7DiedArchbishop of Reims, France

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptist-Marie-Anne-Antoine de Latil:
Jean-Baptist-Marie-Anne-Antoine Cardinal de Latil (born , died ) Archbishop of Reims

  • a priest for 55.9 years
  • a bishop for 23.6 years
  • a cardinal for 13.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1816, Number 7
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 72, and Page 134
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 322

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015