Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jean-Baptiste du Chilleau

Deceased

Archbishop of Tours


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Oct 1735BornLa Charrière
21 Oct 178146.0SelectedBishop of Chalons-sur-Saône, France
10 Dec 178146.2ConfirmedBishop of Chalons-sur-Saône, France
30 Dec 178146.2Ordained BishopBishop of Chalons-sur-Saône, France
8 Nov 181681.1ResignedBishop of Chalons-sur-Saône, France
9 Sep 181781.9SelectedArchbishop of Tours, France
1 Oct 181782.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Tours, France
24 Nov 182489.1DiedArchbishop of Tours, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste du Chilleau:
Archbishop Jean-Baptiste du Chilleau (born , died ) Archbishop of Tours

  • a bishop for 42.9 years

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 381

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013