Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Anne-Louis-Henri Cardinal de La Fare

Deceased

Archbishop of Sens (-Auxerre)

Cardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Traspontina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Sep 1752BornBessay
23 Sep 177523.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Dijon, France
21 Sep 177624.0Ordained PriestPriest of Dijon, France
7 Oct 178735.0SelectedBishop of Nancy, France
17 Dec 178735.2ConfirmedBishop of Nancy, France
13 Jan 178835.3Ordained BishopBishop of Nancy, France
8 Nov 181664.1ResignedBishop of Nancy, France
8 Aug 181764.9SelectedArchbishop of Sens, France
1 Oct 181765.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Sens, France
16 May 182370.6Elevated to Cardinal
24 Nov 182371.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Maria in Traspontina
10 Dec 182977.2DiedArchbishop of Sens (-Auxerre), France

MicroData Summary for Anne-Louis-Henri de La Fare
Anne-Louis-Henri Cardinal de La Fare (born , died ) Archbishop of Sens (-Auxerre)

  • a priest for 53.2 years
  • a bishop for 41.9 years
  • a cardinal for 6.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 342
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1788, Number 1
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church, 16 May 1823

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 May 2016