Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Baptiste de Bouillé

Deceased

Bishop of Poitiers


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Jun 1759³BornSaint-Just-sous-Brioude
26 Mar 178525.8Ordained PriestPriest
9 Sep 181758.2SelectedBishop of Poitiers, France
1 Oct 181758.3ConfirmedBishop of Poitiers, France
28 Oct 181960.4Ordained BishopBishop of Poitiers, France
14 Jan 184282.6DiedBishop of Poitiers, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Baptiste de Bouillé:
Bishop Jean-Baptiste de Bouillé (born , died ) Bishop of Poitiers

  • a priest for 56.8 years
  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 306

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013