Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop René des Monstiers de Mérinville

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Chambéry


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1742BornAuby
25 Feb 178744.6SelectedBishop of Dijon, France
23 Apr 178744.8ConfirmedBishop of Dijon, France
13 May 178744.9Ordained BishopBishop of Dijon, France
21 Jul 178745.1InstalledBishop of Dijon, France
2 Dec 180159.4ResignedBishop of Dijon, France
12 Apr 180259.8SelectedBishop of Chambéry, France
4 May 180259.8ConfirmedBishop of Chambéry, France
Jan 1805³62.5ResignedBishop of Chambéry, France
12 Nov 182987.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Chambéry, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for René des Monstiers de Mérinville:
Bishop René des Monstiers de Mérinville (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Chambéry

  • a bishop for 42.5 years

Source(s):
  • b: Les Évèques et les Archevèques de France
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 147

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 18 Sep 2013