Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Claude-Louis Rousseau

Deceased

Bishop of Orléans


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Nov 1735BornParis
9 Apr 180266.4SelectedBishop of Coutances, France
14 Apr 180266.4ConfirmedBishop of Coutances, France
25 Apr 180266.4Ordained BishopBishop of Coutances, France
7 May 180771.5SelectedBishop of Orléans, France
3 Aug 180771.7ConfirmedBishop of Orléans, France
6 Oct 180771.9InstalledBishop of Orléans, France
7 Oct 181074.9DiedBishop of Orléans, France

MicroData Summary for Claude-Louis Rousseau:
Bishop Claude-Louis Rousseau (born , died ) Bishop of Orléans

  • a bishop for 8.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 96, and Page 160
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1802, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 26 Jan 2015