Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Maurice-Jean-Madeleine de Broglie

Deceased

Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
5 Sep 1766BornBroglie, France
11 Mar 179225.5Ordained PriestPriest
19 May 180538.7SelectedBishop of Acqui, Italy
26 Jun 180538.8ConfirmedBishop of Acqui, Italy
17 Nov 180539.2Ordained BishopBishop of Acqui, Italy
7 May 180740.7SelectedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
3 Aug 180740.9ConfirmedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium
20 Jul 182154.9DiedBishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}, Belgium

MicroData Summary for Maurice-Jean-Madeleine de Broglie:
Bishop Maurice-Jean-Madeleine de Broglie (born , died ) Bishop of Gent {Ghent, Gand}

  • a priest for 29.4 years
  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 83, and Page 202

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013