Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Antoine Arbaud

Deceased

Bishop of Gap


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jun 1768BornManosque
18 Jun 179123.0Ordained PriestPriest
12 Feb 182354.7SelectedBishop of Gap, France
16 May 182355.0ConfirmedBishop of Gap, France
6 Jul 182355.1Ordained BishopBishop of Gap, France
29 Jul 182355.2InstalledBishop of Gap, France
27 Mar 183667.8DiedBishop of Gap, France

MicroData Summary for François-Antoine Arbaud:
Bishop François-Antoine Arbaud (born , died ) Bishop of Gap

  • a priest for 44.8 years
  • a bishop for 12.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 388

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013