Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alexandre-Raymond Devie

Deceased

Bishop of Belley


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jan 1767BornMontélimar
6 Nov 179124.8Ordained PriestPriest of Valence, France
12 Feb 182356.1SelectedBishop of Belley, France
10 Mar 182356.1ConfirmedBishop of Belley, France
15 Jun 182356.4Ordained BishopBishop of Belley, France
25 Jul 185285.5DiedBishop of Belley, France

MicroData Summary for Alexandre-Raymond Devie:
Bishop Alexandre-Raymond Devie (born , died ) Bishop of Belley

  • a priest for 60.7 years
  • a bishop for 29.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 107

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013