Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Georges-Claude-Louis-Pie Chalandon

Deceased

Archbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Feb 1804Born
31 May 182824.2Ordained PriestPriest
7 Jun 185046.3SelectedCoadjutor Bishop of Belley, France
3 Oct 185046.6ConfirmedCoadjutor Bishop of Belley, France
3 Oct 185046.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Thaumacus
12 Jan 185146.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thaumacus
25 Jul 185248.4SucceededBishop of Belley, France
14 Feb 185752.9SelectedArchbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France
19 Mar 185753.0ConfirmedArchbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France
19 May 185753.2InstalledArchbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France
28 Feb 187369.0DiedArchbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun), France

MicroData Summary for Georges-Claude-Louis-Pie Chalandon (VIAF: 4921705)
Archbishop Georges-Claude-Louis-Pie Chalandon (born , died ) Archbishop of Aix (-Arles-Embrun)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLyon
Ordained BishopCathedral, Belley, Diocese of Belley

  • a priest for 44.7 years
  • a bishop for 22.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 113, and Page 144
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 544
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1851, Number 4

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Jan 2017