Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Chatrousse

Deceased

Bishop of Valence, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Jul 1795Born
18 Jul 181924.0Ordained PriestPriest
4 Jun 184044.9SelectedBishop of Valence, France
13 Jul 184045.0ConfirmedBishop of Valence, France
21 Sep 184045.2Ordained BishopBishop of Valence, France
16 May 185761.8DiedBishop of Valence, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre Chatrousse (VIAF: 24593039)
Bishop Pierre Chatrousse (born , died ) Bishop of Valence

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVoiron
Ordained BishopSaint Maurice, Cathedral, Vienne, Archdiocese of Lyon (-Vienne)

  • a priest for 37.8 years
  • a bishop for 16.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 387
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations ╔piscopales, Year 1,840, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast