Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Louis Rossat

Deceased

Bishop of Verdun


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1789BornLyon
19 Dec 181223.0Ordained PriestPriest
6 Jul 184050.6SelectedBishop of Gap, France
14 Dec 184051.0ConfirmedBishop of Gap, France
14 Feb 184151.2Ordained BishopBishop of Gap, France
10 Mar 184151.3InstalledBishop of Gap, France
25 Apr 184454.4SelectedBishop of Verdun, France
17 Jun 184454.5ConfirmedBishop of Verdun, France
13 Jul 184454.6InstalledBishop of Verdun, France
24 Dec 186677.0DiedBishop of Verdun, France

MicroData Summary for Louis Rossat:
Bishop Louis Rossat (born , died ) Bishop of Verdun

  • a priest for 54.0 years
  • a bishop for 25.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 388, and Page 398

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013