Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Louis Coeur

Deceased

Bishop of Troyes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Mar 1805BornTarare
13 Jun 182924.2Ordained PriestPriest
19 Oct 184843.6SelectedBishop of Troyes, France
11 Dec 184843.7ConfirmedBishop of Troyes, France
25 Feb 184943.9Ordained BishopBishop of Troyes, France
9 Oct 186055.6DiedBishop of Troyes, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Louis Coeur:
Bishop Pierre-Louis Coeur (born , died ) Bishop of Troyes

  • a priest for 31.3 years
  • a bishop for 11.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 563

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013