Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Charles-Nicolas-Pierre Didiot

Deceased

Bishop of Bayeux (-Lisieux), France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jun 1797³Born
22 Dec 182124.4Ordained PriestPriest of Verdun, France
3 May 185658.8SelectedBishop of Bayeux (-Lisieux), France
16 Jun 185658.9ConfirmedBishop of Bayeux (-Lisieux), France
3 Aug 185659.1Ordained BishopBishop of Bayeux (-Lisieux), France
15 Jun 186668.9DiedBishop of Bayeux (-Lisieux), France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Charles-Nicolas-Pierre Didiot (VIAF: 107023027)
Bishop Charles-Nicolas-Pierre Didiot (born , died ) Bishop of Bayeux (-Lisieux)

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEsnes-en-Argonne
Ordained BishopNotre-Dame, Cathedral, Verdun, Diocese of Verdun

  • a priest for 44.4 years
  • a bishop for 9.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 138
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1856, Number 31

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 16 Jan 2017