Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Désiré-Michel Vesque

Deceased

Bishop of Roseau, Dominica, Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Nov 1817Born
1840¹22.1Ordained PriestPriest
19 Aug 185638.7AppointedBishop of Roseau, Dominica, Antilles
26 Oct 185638.9Ordained BishopBishop of Roseau, Dominica, Antilles
10 Jul 185840.6DiedBishop of Roseau, Dominica, Antilles

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Désiré-Michel Vesque
Bishop Désiré-Michel Vesque (born , died ) Bishop of Roseau

EventPlace
Birth PlaceHonfleur, Diocese of Bayeux, France
Ordained BishopSt Mary, Moorfields, Archdiocese of Westminster, England, Great Britain
Buried Place (Original)Virgo Fidelis, Convent, Cemetery, Norwood, London, Archdiocese of Southwark, England, Great Britain

  • a priest for 18.5 years
  • a bishop for 1.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 485
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1856, Number 45
  • 23.loc: CL, 7 Jul 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 19 Sep 2019

Quantcast