Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrice-François-Marie Cruice

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Marseille, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Jul 1815Born
21 Dec 184429.4Ordained PriestPriest
20 Jun 186145.8SelectedBishop of Marseille, France
22 Jul 186145.9ConfirmedBishop of Marseille, France
25 Aug 186146.0Ordained BishopBishop of Marseille, France
1 Sep 186550.0ResignedBishop of Marseille, France
12 Oct 186651.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Marseille, France

MicroData Summary for Patrice-François-Marie Cruice (VIAF: 36909704)
Bishop Patrice-François-Marie Cruice (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Marseille

EventPlace
Birth PlaceKillaloë, Diocese of Killaloe, Ireland, Ireland
Ordained BishopCarmes-rue de Vaugirard, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a priest for 21.8 years
  • a bishop for 5.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 372
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1861, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Jan 2017