Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marie-Auguste Fabre-des-Essarts

Deceased

Bishop of Blois, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Aug 1795Born
7 Mar 181822.5Ordained PriestPriest
25 Apr 184448.6SelectedBishop of Blois, France
17 Jun 184448.8ConfirmedBishop of Blois, France
25 Jul 184448.9Ordained BishopBishop of Blois, France
20 Oct 185055.1DiedBishop of Blois, France

MicroData Summary for Marie-Auguste Fabre-des-Essarts
Bishop Marie-Auguste Fabre-des-Essarts (born , died ) Bishop of Blois

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAouste-Sur-Sye
Ordained BishopCathedral, Blois, Diocese of Blois

  • a priest for 32.6 years
  • a bishop for 6.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 113
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1844, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018