Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Jacques Fayet

Deceased

Bishop of Orléans


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Jul 1787BornMende
1811¹23.4Ordained PriestPriest
15 Oct 184255.2SelectedBishop of Orléans, France
27 Jan 184355.5ConfirmedBishop of Orléans, France
26 Feb 184355.5Ordained BishopBishop of Orléans, France
4 Apr 184961.6DiedBishop of Orléans, France

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Jean-Jacques Fayet:
Bishop Jean-Jacques Fayet (born , died ) Bishop of Orléans

  • a priest for 38.2 years
  • a bishop for 6.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 96

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015