Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Etienne-Bruno-Marie d’Arbou

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Bayonne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Dec 1778BornToulouse
17 Dec 180829.9Ordained PriestPriest
12 Feb 182344.1SelectedBishop of Verdun, France
16 May 182344.3ConfirmedBishop of Verdun, France
13 Jul 182344.5Ordained BishopBishop of Verdun, France
13 Mar 1827³48.2ResignedBishop of Verdun, France
28 Mar 183051.2SelectedBishop of Bayonne, France
5 Jul 183051.5ConfirmedBishop of Bayonne, France
26 Sep 183758.7ResignedBishop of Bayonne, France
3 Sep 185879.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Bayonne, France

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Etienne-Bruno-Marie d’Arbou
Bishop Etienne-Bruno-Marie d’Arbou (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Bayonne

  • a priest for 49.7 years
  • a bishop for 35.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 103, and Page 397
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1823, Number 35

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 17 Jul 2016