Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop François-Marie-Edouard de Gualy

Deceased

Archbishop of Albi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1786BornCreissels
19 Jun 181124.7Ordained PriestPriest
15 Jul 182942.7SelectedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
28 Sep 182942.9ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
30 Nov 182943.1Ordained BishopBishop of Saint-Flour, France
3 Mar 183043.4InstalledBishop of Saint-Flour, France
18 Jun 183346.7SelectedArchbishop of Albi, France
30 Sep 183346.9ConfirmedArchbishop of Albi, France
16 Jun 184255.6DiedArchbishop of Albi, France

MicroData Summary for François-Marie-Edouard de Gualy:
Archbishop François-Marie-Edouard de Gualy (born , died ) Archbishop of Albi

  • a priest for 31.0 years
  • a bishop for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 65, and Page 196

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013