Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joseph-Julien de Saint-Rome-Gualy

Deceased

Bishop of Carcassonne


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1765BornMillau
18 Sep 179025.3Ordained PriestPriest
30 Dec 182459.6SelectedBishop of Carcassonne, France
21 Mar 182559.8ConfirmedBishop of Carcassonne, France
24 Apr 182559.9Ordained BishopBishop of Carcassonne, France
6 Oct 184782.3DiedBishop of Carcassonne, France

MicroData Summary for Joseph-Julien de Saint-Rome-Gualy:
Bishop Joseph-Julien de Saint-Rome-Gualy (born , died ) Bishop of Carcassonne

  • a priest for 57.1 years
  • a bishop for 22.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 133

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013