Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gervais-Marie-Joseph Ortric

Deceased

Bishop of Pamiers, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 May 1763Born
2 Jun 178724.0Ordained PriestPriest
10 Apr 183571.8SelectedBishop of Pamiers, France
24 Jul 183572.1ConfirmedBishop of Pamiers, France
27 Sep 183572.3Ordained BishopBishop of Pamiers, France
12 Nov 184582.4DiedBishop of Pamiers, France

MicroData Summary for Gervais-Marie-Joseph Ortric
Bishop Gervais-Marie-Joseph Ortric (born , died ) Bishop of Pamiers

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBaziège

  • a priest for 58.4 years
  • a bishop for 10.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 82
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1835, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Feb 2017