Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean-Jacques-David Bardou

Deceased

Bishop of Cahors


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Dec 1798BornLautrec
21 Dec 182224.0Ordained PriestPriest of Albi, France
20 May 184243.4SelectedBishop of Cahors, France
22 Jul 184243.6ConfirmedBishop of Cahors, France
9 Oct 184243.8Ordained BishopBishop of Cahors, France
30 Jan 186364.1DiedBishop of Cahors, France

MicroData Summary for Jean-Jacques-David Bardou (VIAF: 103649581)
Bishop Jean-Jacques-David Bardou (born , died ) Bishop of Cahors

  • a priest for 40.1 years
  • a bishop for 20.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 143
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1842, Number 58

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 25 Nov 2016