Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Paul-Thérèse-David Cardinal d’Astros

Deceased

Archbishop of Toulouse (-Narbonne)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1772BornTourves
23 Sep 179724.9Ordained PriestPriest
9 Sep 181744.9SelectedBishop of Orange, France
1 Oct 181745.0ConfirmedBishop of Orange, France
30 Nov 181947.1SelectedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
21 Feb 182047.3ConfirmedBishop of Saint-Flour, France
4 Mar 182047.4SelectedBishop of Bayonne, France
29 May 182047.6ConfirmedBishop of Bayonne, France
9 Jul 182047.7Ordained BishopBishop of Bayonne, France
28 Mar 183057.5SelectedArchbishop of Toulouse (-Narbonne), France
5 Jul 183057.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Toulouse (-Narbonne), France
30 Sep 185078.0Elevated to Cardinal
29 Sep 185179.0DiedArchbishop of Toulouse (-Narbonne), France

MicroData Summary for Paul-Thérèse-David d’Astros:
Cardinal Paul-Thérèse-David d’Astros (born , died ) Archbishop of Toulouse (-Narbonne)

  • a priest for 54.0 years
  • a bishop for 31.2 years
  • a cardinal for 1.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 96, and Page 103
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 196, and Page 367

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013