Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Toussaint (Raffaele Sante) Casanelli d’Istria

Deceased

Bishop of Ajaccio, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1794Born
181722.1Ordained PriestPriest
31 Jul 183338.7SelectedBishop of Ajaccio, France
30 Sep 183338.9ConfirmedBishop of Ajaccio, France
8 Dec 183339.1Ordained BishopBishop of Ajaccio, France
12 Oct 186974.9DiedBishop of Ajaccio, France

MicroData Summary for Toussaint (Raffaele Sante) Casanelli d’Istria (VIAF: 36909829)
Bishop Toussaint (Raffaele Sante) Casanelli d’Istria (born , died ) Bishop of Ajaccio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceChigliani

  • a priest for 52.7 years
  • a bishop for 35.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 58
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1833, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018