Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jean Sarrabeyrouse (Sarebayrouze)

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Ajaccio

Titular Bishop of Etalonia (Hetalonia)


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Apr 1796BornMerville
1 Jun 182226.1Ordained PriestPriest
10 Apr 185155.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Ajaccio, France
10 Apr 185155.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Etalonia (Hetalonia)
19 Oct 185155.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Etalonia (Hetalonia)
15 Oct 187781.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Ajaccio, France

MicroData Summary for Jean Sarrabeyrouse (Sarebayrouze):
Bishop Jean Sarrabeyrouse (Sarebayrouze) (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Ajaccio

  • a priest for 55.4 years
  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 304

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013