Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Bernard Buissas

Deceased

Bishop of Limoges, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Nov 1796Born
16 Jun 182124.5Ordained PriestPriest
25 Apr 184447.4SelectedBishop of Limoges, France
17 Jun 184447.5ConfirmedBishop of Limoges, France
4 Aug 184447.6Ordained BishopBishop of Limoges, France
24 Dec 185660.0DiedBishop of Limoges, France

MicroData Summary for Bernard Buissas (VIAF: 79017599)
Bishop Bernard Buissas (born , died ) Bishop of Limoges

EventPlace
Birth PlaceToulouse

  • a priest for 35.5 years
  • a bishop for 12.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 235
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1844, Number 54

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast