Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jacques-Marie-Joseph Baillès

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Luçon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Mar 1798BornToulouse
22 Dec 182123.7Ordained PriestPriest
15 Aug 184547.4SelectedBishop of Luçon, France
24 Nov 184547.6ConfirmedBishop of Luçon, France
4 Jan 184647.8Ordained BishopBishop of Luçon, France
2 Mar 185657.9ResignedBishop of Luçon, France
17 Nov 187375.6DiedBishop Emeritus of Luçon, France

MicroData Summary for Jacques-Marie-Joseph Baillès:
Bishop Jacques-Marie-Joseph Baillès (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Luçon

  • a priest for 51.9 years
  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 245

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013