Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Domenico Fanelli

Deceased

Bishop of Diano-Teggiano


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jul 1807BornRiccia di Molise
18 Sep 183023.2Ordained PriestPriest of Benevento, Italy
27 Sep 185851.2AppointedBishop of Diano-Teggiano, Italy
3 Oct 185851.3Ordained BishopBishop of Diano-Teggiano, Italy
14 Aug 188376.1DiedBishop of Diano-Teggiano, Italy

MicroData Summary for Domenico Fanelli:
Bishop Domenico Fanelli (born , died ) Bishop of Diano-Teggiano

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 24.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1872
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 244

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013