Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Jacques-Marie-Adrien-Césaire Cardinal Mathieu

Deceased

Archbishop of Besançon

Cardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
20 Jan 1796BornParis
1 Jun 182226.4Ordained PriestPriest
4 Oct 183236.7SelectedBishop of Langres, France
17 Dec 183236.9ConfirmedBishop of Langres, France
20 Feb 183337.1Ordained BishopBishop of Langres, France
12 Jul 183438.5SelectedArchbishop of Besançon, France
30 Sep 183438.7ConfirmedArchbishop of Besançon, France
30 Sep 185054.7Elevated to Cardinal
18 Mar 185256.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Silvestro in Capite
9 Jul 187579.5DiedArchbishop of Besançon, France

MicroData Summary for Jacques-Marie-Adrien-Césaire Mathieu:
Cardinal Jacques-Marie-Adrien-Césaire Mathieu (born , died ) Archbishop of Besançon

  • a priest for 53.1 years
  • a bishop for 42.4 years
  • a cardinal for 24.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 8, Page 52
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 7, Page 112, and Page 241

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013