Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Augustin Hacquard

Deceased

Bishop of Verdun, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 May 1809Born
1 Jun 183324.0Ordained PriestPriest
19 Jan 186757.6SelectedBishop of Verdun, France
27 Mar 186757.8ConfirmedBishop of Verdun, France
1 May 186757.9Ordained BishopBishop of Verdun, France
31 May 188475.0DiedBishop of Verdun, France

MicroData Summary for Augustin Hacquard
Bishop Augustin Hacquard (born , died ) Bishop of Verdun

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEpinal
Ordained BishopLa Madeleine, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris

  • a priest for 50.9 years
  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 592
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1867, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Mar 2017