Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Charles-Théodore Colet

Deceased

Archbishop of Tours


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
30 Apr 1806BornGérardmer
18 Dec 183024.6Ordained PriestPriest
8 Jun 186155.1SelectedBishop of Luçon, France
22 Jul 186155.2ConfirmedBishop of Luçon, France
25 Aug 186155.3Ordained BishopBishop of Luçon, France
30 Nov 187468.5SelectedArchbishop of Tours, France
21 Dec 187468.6ConfirmedArchbishop of Tours, France
3 Feb 187568.7InstalledArchbishop of Tours, France
30 Nov 188377.5DiedArchbishop of Tours, France

MicroData Summary for Charles-Théodore Colet:
Archbishop Charles-Théodore Colet (born , died ) Archbishop of Tours

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 22.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 351, and Page 573

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015