Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop François-Victor Rivet

Deceased

Bishop of Dijon, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1796Born
5 Jun 181923.0Ordained PriestPriest
19 May 183841.9SelectedBishop of Dijon, France
13 Sep 183842.2ConfirmedBishop of Dijon, France
21 Oct 183842.3Ordained BishopBishop of Dijon, France
12 Jul 188488.1DiedBishop of Dijon, France

MicroData Summary for François-Victor Rivet (VIAF: 100957599)
Bishop François-Victor Rivet (born , died ) Bishop of Dijon

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSaint-Germain-en-Laye

  • a priest for 65.1 years
  • a bishop for 45.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 178
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1838, Number 39

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 28 Jan 2017