Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Joachim-Hyacinthe Gonin, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Dec 1814Born
12 Oct 185338.8ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Preachers
1854²39.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
2 Jun 186348.4AppointedArchbishop of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles
27 Dec 186349.0Ordained BishopArchbishop of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles
8 Mar 188974.2DiedArchbishop of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Joachim-Hyacinthe Gonin (VIAF: 44396769)
Archbishop Joachim-Hyacinthe Gonin O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Port of Spain

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBourgouin, France
Ordained BishopMinerve, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

  • a priest for 35.1 years
  • a bishop for 25.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 466
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1863, Number 30

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017