Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Eugène-Louis-Marie Lion, O.P. †

Deceased

Apostolic Delegate to Mesopotamia, Kurdistan, and Lesser Armenia, Iraq

Titular Archbishop of Tamiathis

Apostolic Administrator of Baghdad


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1826Born
3 Mar 187447.7AppointedApostolic Administrator of Baghdad, Iraq
13 Mar 187447.7AppointedApostolic Delegate to Mesopotamia, Kurdistan, and Lesser Armenia, Iraq
13 Mar 187447.7AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tamiathis
12 Apr 187447.8Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tamiathis
8 Aug 188357.1DiedApostolic Delegate to Mesopotamia, Kurdistan, and Lesser Armenia, Iraq

MicroData Summary for Eugène-Louis-Marie Lion (VIAF: 316444377)
Archbishop Eugène-Louis-Marie Lion O.P. (born , died ) Apostolic Delegate of Mesopotamia, Kurdistan, and Lesser Armenia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceReims, Archdiocese of Reims, France
Ordained BishopCarmelite Church, Paris, Archdiocese of Paris, France

  • a bishop for 9.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 137, and Page 239
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1874, Number 19

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 6 Mar 2017