Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Port of Spain

Archidioecesis Portus Hispaniae



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Joseph Everard Harris, C.S.Sp., Archbishop
  • Robert Anthony Llanos, Auxiliary Bishop
  • Edward Joseph Gilbert, C.SS.R., Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Erected: 30 April 1850
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Trinidad and Tobago
  • Region: Antilles (West Indies)
  • Square Kilometers: 5,128 (1,980 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.archpos.org/
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's House, 27 Maraval Road, Port of Spain, Trinidad, W.I.
  • Telephone: (868)622-1103
  • Fax: 622-1165

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of Trinidad
23 February 1818ErectedVicariate Apostolic of Trinidad (erected)
10 January 1837Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Trinidad Vicariate Apostolic of Giamaica o Jamaica (erected)
30 April 1850Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Trinidad Diocese of Roseau (erected)
Archdiocese of Port of Spain
30 April 1850ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of West Indies Archdiocese of Port of Spain (erected)
20 February 1956Territory LostArchdiocese of Port of Spain Diocese of Saint George’s in Grenada (erected) (Grenada)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Port of Spain
1950280,000750,00037.3%81021102,5456821263ap1951
1966299,649827,95736.2%181181362,2035125559ap1967
1968350,0001,035,00033.8%201161362,57315028159ap1971
1974370,0001,101,82433.6%171121292,86815025061ap1977
1980370,0001,102,00033.6%23921153,217112319459ap1981
1990400,0001,235,40032.4%35821173,41811317661ap1991
1999395,0001,250,00031.6%4347904,3887118262ap2000
2000395,0001,250,00031.6%39671063,7268214961ap2001
2001383,3021,277,67530.0%44661103,4848017561ap2002
2002383,3021,277,67530.0%42701123,4228514961ap2003
2003383,3021,277,67530.0%44721163,3048614961ap2004
2004383,3021,277,67530.0%45761213,1679414761ap2005
2010340,0001,310,00026.0%46601063,2077614261ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 29 Dec 2013