Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop George Vincent King, O.P. †

Deceased

Coadjutor Archbishop of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles

Titular Archbishop of Iuliopolis


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1837Born
11 Sep 188548.4AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles
11 Sep 188548.4AppointedTitular Archbishop of Iuliopolis
6 Dec 188548.6Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Iuliopolis
25 Feb 188648.8DiedCoadjutor Archbishop of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles

MicroData Summary for George Vincent King
Archbishop George Vincent King O.P. (born , died ) Coadjutor Archbishop of Port of Spain

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBecca
Ordained BishopWoodchester

  • a bishop for .2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 326, and Page 466
  • c3: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 227, Additions/Corrections (back)
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1885, Number 63

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 May 2017