Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop James Buckley

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of Trinidad, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles

Titular Bishop of Geras


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1770Born
24 Dec 179424.8Ordained PriestPriest
6 Mar 181949.0AppointedVicar Apostolic of Trinidad, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles
6 Mar 181949.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Geras
29 Jun 181949.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Geras
26 Mar 182858.0DiedVicar Apostolic of Trinidad, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles

MicroData Summary for James Buckley
Bishop James Buckley (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic of Trinidad

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLondon

  • a priest for 33.2 years
  • a bishop for 8.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 7, Page 202
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 198, Number 16,147
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1819, Number 36

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018