Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Douglass

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic of London District, England, Great Britain

Titular Bishop of Centuria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
Dec 1743³Born
1768²24.0Ordained PriestPriest of Northern District, England, Great Britain
10 Sep 179046.7AppointedVicar Apostolic of London District, England, Great Britain
10 Sep 179046.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Centuria
19 Dec 179047.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Centuria
8 May 181268.4DiedVicar Apostolic of London District, England, Great Britain

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for John Douglass (VIAF: 61880977)
Bishop John Douglass (born Dec 1743, died ) Vicar Apostolic of London District

EventPlace
Birth PlaceYarm, North Yorkshire, Vicariate Apostolic of Northern District, England
Ordained PriestEnglish, College, Douai, Archdiocese of Cambrai, France
Ordained BishopLulworth Castle, East Lulworth, Wareham, Dorset, Vicariate Apostolic of Western District, England
Death PlaceCastle Street, Holborn, London, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England
Buried Place (Original)Old St. Pancras Churchyard, London, Vicariate Apostolic of London District, England
Buried Place (Current)St. Edmund's, College, Ware, Hertfordshire, Archdiocese of Westminster, England

  • a priest for 44.3 years
  • a bishop for 21.3 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Number 15,535
  • b: Arundel to Zabi, Page 82
  • op: CB, 13 Feb 2016
  • b/c2: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1790, Number 32
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 6, Page 159, and Page 454
  • loc: CL, 20 Jan 2018
  • bp: CL, 22 Jan 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 27 Jan 2018