Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop John Pius Dowling, O.P. †

Deceased

Archbishop of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Jun 1860BornFreshford, Ireland
4 Jun 188726.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
13 Feb 190948.6AppointedArchbishop of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles
16 May 190948.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles
6 Jun 194080.0DiedArchbishop of Port of Spain, Trinidad and Tobago, Antilles

MicroData Summary for John Pius Dowling:
Archbishop John Pius Dowling O.P. (born , died ) Archbishop of Port of Spain

  • a priest for 53.0 years
  • a bishop for 31.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: JPG
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1909, Number 26

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013