Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Abraham Brownrigg, S.S.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Ossory, Ireland


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1836Born
21 Apr 186124.3Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Blessed Sacrament
28 Oct 188447.9AppointedBishop of Ossory, Ireland
14 Dec 188448.0Ordained BishopBishop of Ossory, Ireland
1 Oct 192891.8DiedBishop of Ossory, Ireland

MicroData Summary for Abraham Brownrigg (VIAF: 304914835)
Bishop Abraham Brownrigg S.S.S. (born , died ) Bishop of Ossory

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBallypierce, Diocese of Kildare and Leighlin
Ordained BishopSt. Mary, Cathedral, Kilkenny

  • a priest for 67.4 years
  • a bishop for 43.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1927
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 430
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1884, Number 65

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 21 Apr 2017