Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Sydney

Archidioecesis Sydneyensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Anthony Colin Joseph Fisher, O.P., Archbishop
  • Peter Andrew Comensoli, Apostolic Administrator
  • Terence John Gerard Brady, Auxiliary Bishop
  • David Cremin, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus
  • Geoffrey James Robinson, Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 22 April 1842
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Australia
  • Square Kilometers: 1,264 (488 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.sydneycatholic.org/
  • Mailing Address: Level 16, Polding Centre, 133 Liverpool Street, Sydney, NSW 2000, Australia
  • Telephone: (02)93.90.51.00
  • Fax: 92.61.83.12

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Vicariate Apostolic of New Holland and Van Diemen’s Land
1834ErectedVicariate Apostolic of New Holland and Van Diemen’s Land (erected)
5 April 1842Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of New Holland and Van Diemen’s Land Vicariate Apostolic of Adelaide (erected)
5 April 1842Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of New Holland and Van Diemen’s Land Vicariate Apostolic of Hobart (erected)
Diocese of Sydney
5 April 1842ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of New Holland and Van Diemen’s Land Diocese of Sydney
Archdiocese of Sydney
22 April 1842ElevatedDiocese of Sydney Archdiocese of Sydney
1845Territory LostArchdiocese of Sydney Vicariate Apostolic of Essington (erected)
1845Territory LostDiocese of Adelaide
Archdiocese of Sydney
Vicariate Apostolic of King George Sounde - The Sound (erected)
6 May 1845Territory LostArchdiocese of Sydney Diocese of Perth (erected)
25 June 1847Territory LostArchdiocese of Sydney Diocese of Melbourne (erected)
25 June 1847Territory LostArchdiocese of Sydney Diocese of Maitland (erected)
12 April 1859Territory LostArchdiocese of Sydney Diocese of Brisbane (erected)
17 November 1862Territory LostArchdiocese of Sydney Diocese of Goulburn (erected)
20 June 1865Territory LostArchdiocese of Sydney Diocese of Bathurst (erected)
15 November 1951Territory LostArchdiocese of Sydney Diocese of Wollongong (erected)
8 April 1986Territory LostArchdiocese of Sydney Diocese of Broken Bay (erected)
8 April 1986Territory LostArchdiocese of Sydney Diocese of Parramatta (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Sydney
1950414,9101,885,81822.0%3162565727257562,388165ap1951
1966634,3202,996,60021.2%4293147438537382,674199ap1967
1968634,3202,200,00028.8%4263387648301,1583,011200ap1971
1980838,0953,098,60027.0%4153898041,0421,1302,499221ap1981
1990801,0002,513,40031.9%2212744951,6187782,020141ap1991
1999589,2441,824,81032.3%2282704981,18312871,368137ap2000
2000589,2441,824,81032.3%2182704881,20712861,388137ap2001
2001589,0121,825,01232.3%1942724661,26343041,376137ap2002
2002589,0421,825,01232.3%1932544471,31742861,388138ap2003
2003578,5671,993,23629.0%2222654871,18852861,388138ap2004
2004578,5671,993,23629.0%2542655191,11455251,383139ap2005
2010634,0002,366,00026.8%2372414781,32654721,111138ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v3.0.0, 8 Mar 2014; data: 19 Sep 2014